CO HB1325 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-7)
Status: Passed on June 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning establishing a school finance legislative interim committee to consider changes to the method for funding public schools to improve student achievement, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Funding Public Schools Formula

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1325 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1325 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 21-1325, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1325, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-29 Governor Signed
2021-06-17 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-16HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-16SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-08SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-07SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-07SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-06-04SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2021-06-04SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2021-06-04HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-06-03HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2021-06-03HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-06-03HouseHouse Committee on Education Refer Amended to Appropriations
2021-05-27HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Education

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1325
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1325_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1325_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1325_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1325_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1325_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1325_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1325_L.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1325_J.001.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1325_L.003.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1325_r1.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1325_hse.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6d7590730bff9b5c872586e90057eace-hb21-1325-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/6d7590730bff9b5c872586e90057eace-hb21-1325-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/9b4f65c4469195f2872586e9004d39f5-hb21-1325-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1325vote6cd06d
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4d1f014d3d630b91872586ea0082302f-hb21-1325-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7594f201c69edae9872586ed006507c3-hb21-1325-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1325vote5bc0a7

Bill Comments 750

feedback