CO HB1323 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-13 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-13 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Montrose Associate County Judge
Title
Montrose Associate County Judge
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1323 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1323 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001(Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1323, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001(Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1323, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-28 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 12-1323 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001(Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1323, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved amendment L.001(Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2012-03-14 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 12-1323, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-13 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2012-04-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2012-04-03 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-02 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2012-03-23 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary | |
2012-03-21 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-20 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-19 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2012-03-14 | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2012-03-09 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |