CO HB1311 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Procedures When Orders Require Monetary Payments
Title
Procedures When Orders Require Monetary Payments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1311 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1311 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1311, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1311 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-27 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1311 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1311, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-05-11 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-05-10 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-05-10 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-05-02 | House | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2016-04-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-04-07 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2016-04-04 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2016-03-24 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |