CO HB1310 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-13)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-13)
Status: Passed on June 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the alignment of the state income tax deduction for contributions to a 529 account with the changes in the federal "Setting Every Community Up for Retirement Enhancement Act of 2019" that allows tax-free distributions for eligible apprenticeship programs.
Title
529 Account Apprenticeship Expenses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1310 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1310 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1310 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1310 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 22-1310 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1310 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1310 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1310 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-14 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 22-1310 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - House Education: Refer House Bill 22-1310 to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-03 | Governor Signed | |
2022-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-06-01 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-06-01 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2022-04-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-22 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2022-04-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-04-21 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-14 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-03-31 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Finance |
2022-03-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |