CO HB1310 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Enrolled on June 21 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-21 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning additional protections for homeowners' freedom of expression in common interest communities under the "Colorado Common Interest Ownership Act".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homeowners' Association Regulation Of Flags And Signs

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-21 Sent to the Governor
2021-06-21HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-06-21SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-06-01SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-28SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-28SenateSenate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-05-27SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs
2021-05-27HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-05-26HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2021-05-25HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-05-10HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1310
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1310_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1310_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1310_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1310_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1310_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1310_enr.pdf
Amendmenthttps://s3-us-west-2.amazonaws.com/leg.colorado.gov/2021A/amendments/HB1310_L.001.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1310_00.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/94a1b8000000e7ca872586e0007d1004-hb21-1310-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1310vote546227
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/799df3b0e73220e7872586e3006f78b6-hb21-1310-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1310vote63eacd
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/94a1b8000000e7ca872586e0007d1004-hb21-1310-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments 750

feedback