CO HB1310 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of a pilot program for emergency employment support services.
Title
Emergency Employment Support Services Pilot Program DOLA
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1310 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1310 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1310, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1310, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1310 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1310, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 18-1310, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-04-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-23 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2018-04-20 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/23/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2018-04-19 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-05 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-03-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor + Appropriations |