CO HB1309 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Repurposing DOC Day Surgery Center
Title
Repurposing DOC Day Surgery Center
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1309 to the Committee of the Whole and place on the consent calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1309 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1309 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1309, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1309 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1309 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1309, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-06 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-05-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-14 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2014-04-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-14 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-11 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-10 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-10 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-25 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2014-03-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |