CO HB1308 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-28 - House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a clarification under the Colorado open meetings law of the requirements governing communication by electronic mail that do not relate to the substance of public business.
Title
Nonsubstantive Emails And Open Meetings Law
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1308 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-28 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 12/31/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-14 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/30/2020 - No Amendments |
2020-03-13 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2020-03-10 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2020-02-21 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |