CO HB1305 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the timing of an inquiry into a job applicant's criminal history.
Title
Limits On Job Applicant Criminal History Inquiries
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1305 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1305 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1305 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1305, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1305, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1305 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 17-1305 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1305, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1305, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-04-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-04-21 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-13 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2017-03-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |