CO HB1305 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-28 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Address Possible Tobacco Settlement Payment Reducs
Title
Address Possible Tobacco Settlement Payment Reducs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended recommend consent calendar The motion passed on a vote of 6-0. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended recommend consent calendar The motion passed on a vote of 6-0. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1305 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1305 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1305 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1305 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1305, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1305, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-02 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW unamended recommend consent calendar The motion passed on a vote of 6-0. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1305 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1305 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1305 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1305 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1305, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1305, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved Amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-28 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-05-21 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2013-04-22 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-19 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-04-18 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2013-04-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |