CO HB1303 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning measures to limit the global warming potential for certain materials used in public projects, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Global Warming Potential For Public Project Materials
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1303 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 21-1303 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment M) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment L) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 21-1303 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.005) (Y: 23 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-05-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1303, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 21-1303, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 21-1303, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1303 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 21-1303 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.008 (Attachment M) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment L) (Y: 3 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 21-1303 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.005) (Y: 23 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2021-05-21 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1303, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 21-1303, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Energy & Environment: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment B). (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Energy & Environment: Refer House Bill 21-1303, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-06 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-21 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-07 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-06-02 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-25 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |
2021-05-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-22 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-05-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-21 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-20 | House | House Committee on Energy & Environment Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-05-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Energy & Environment |