CO HB1300 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a requirement that contractors for public projects over five hundred thousand dollars that are not funded using federal moneys use apprentices for the parts of the project that are performed by workers in an apprenticeable occupation.
Title
Apprentice Utilization In Public Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1300 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1300 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1300 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1300 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House Business Affairs and Labor: Refer House Bill 17-1300 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-04-24 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-21 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2017-04-19 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/21/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-04-13 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs and Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs and Labor |