CO HB1299 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning establishing an office of gun violence prevention, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Office Of Gun Violence Prevention
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 20 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1299 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1299 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.016) (Y: 23 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-05-14 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.015) (Y: 22 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-05-14 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.014) (Y: 23 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-05-14 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.012) (Y: 22 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-05-14 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.010) (Y: 22 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-05-14 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.009) (Y: 22 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-05-14 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.008) (Y: 22 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-05-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1299 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1299 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-07 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-07 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1299 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1299 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 21-1299 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-14 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.016) (Y: 23 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-05-14 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.015) (Y: 22 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-05-14 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.014) (Y: 23 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-05-14 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.012) (Y: 22 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-05-14 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.010) (Y: 22 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-05-14 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.009) (Y: 22 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-05-14 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (l.008) (Y: 22 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2021-05-14 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1299 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1299 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-07 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment C) (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-07 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment D) (Y: 5 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-07 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1299 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-19 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2021-05-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-14 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-05-14 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-07 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-04-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |