CO HB1294 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning mobile homes that are located in a mobile home park, and, in connection therewith, specifying legal rights and responsibilities relating to the sale, lease, and purchase of such homes and making an appropriation.
Title
Mobile Homes in Mobile Home Parks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1294 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer House Bill 24-1294, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1294, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1294, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment L) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment K) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment J) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment I) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment H) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment G) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1294, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government & Housing: Refer House Bill 24-1294, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-14 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1294, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1294, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.007 (Attachment L) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.006 (Attachment K) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment J) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment I) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment H) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment G) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-19 - House - House Transportation, Housing & Local Government: Refer House Bill 24-1294, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government & Housing Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government & Housing |
2024-04-14 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-12 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 04/14/2024 - No Amendments |
2024-04-11 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-10 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-19 | House | House Committee on Transportation, Housing & Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2024-02-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation, Housing & Local Government |