CO HB1289 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning an exemption from forced pooling of certain governmental entities that own mineral rights.
Title
Exempt Local Government School Districts Forced Pooling
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Foote [D] | Rep. David Young [D] | Sen. Matt Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 18-1289 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1289 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1289 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.002 [Attachment B] (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-26 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment A] (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-26 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1289, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 18-1289 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 18-1289 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.002 [Attachment B] (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-26 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Adopt amendment L.001 [Attachment A] (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-26 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1289, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2018-05-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-30 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-27 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-26 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2018-03-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |