CO HB1286 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning allowing school personnel to give medical marijuana to a student with a medical marijuana registry card while at school.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School Nurse Give Medical Marijuana At School

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 49 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-04 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 53 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1286, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-25 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1286, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 47 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1286, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 18-1286, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-04 Governor Signed
2018-05-18 Sent to the Governor
2018-05-18SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2018-05-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2018-05-04SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2018-05-01SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2018-05-01SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-30SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2018-04-25SenateSenate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2018-04-12SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services
2018-04-12HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2018-04-11HouseHouse Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor
2018-04-10HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 04/11/2018 - No Amendments
2018-04-05HouseHouse Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2018-03-08HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb18-1286
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1286_01.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1286_eng.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1286_ren.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1286_rv2.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1286_rer.pdf
Texthttp://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2018A/bills/2018a_1286_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hhie2018a2018-04-05t135359z-hb18-1286-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hhie2018a2018-04-05t135359z-hb18-1286-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1286vote56f93e
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/shhs2018a2018-04-25t104827z-hb18-1286-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1286vote5e7e76
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/shhs2018a2018-04-25t104827z-hb18-1286-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1286vote73e7f5
Roll Callhttp://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb18-1286vote7402b2

Bill Comments

feedback