CO HB1283 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning measures to address consumer protection concerns regarding vehicle towing, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Vehicle Towing Consumer Protection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 43 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1283, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1283, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 21-1283 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1283, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.002, as amended by L.004 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1283, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 43 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1283, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1283, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 21-1283 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 40 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1283, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.002, as amended by L.004 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-13 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1283, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-08 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-06-03 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2021-05-20 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-05-19 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-05-17 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-05-13 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-19 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |