CO HB1282 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning administration of the court-appointed special advocate program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Court-appointed Special Advocate Program Oversight

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1282 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-23 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1282, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1282, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 19-1282, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28 Governor Signed
2019-05-10SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-10 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-10HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-04-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-26SenateSenate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-25SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-24SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2019-04-24HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-23HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-23HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-04-09HouseHouse Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-03-28HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary

Subjects


Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1282
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1282_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1282_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1282_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1282_rn2.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1282_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1282_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1282_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7ea705de4fb9a9e1872583d7008046f2-hb19-1282-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/7ea705de4fb9a9e1872583d7008046f2-hb19-1282-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bbcb196f2f6dce0c872583e5004d1e47-hb19-1282-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bbcb196f2f6dce0c872583e5004d1e47-hb19-1282-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1282vote606db3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2336c30c2d13a343872583e800074c53-hb19-1282-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1282vote670d35

Bill Comments

feedback