CO HB1281 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-17 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Terminal Patients Investigational Drugs
Title
Terminal Patients Investigational Drugs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.012, as amended (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1281, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Amend prepared amendment L.012 (Attachment C), line 5, strike "not been eligible for" and substitute "been unable to participate in" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment A), as amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend proposed committee amendment (HB1281_L.003), page 3, line 5, after "in-home" insert "health" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1281, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.013 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1281, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Amend prepared amendment L.012 (Attachment C), line 5, strike "not been eligible for" and substitute "been unable to participate in" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.004 (Attachment C) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment A), as amended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.005 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Amend proposed committee amendment (HB1281_L.003), page 3, line 5, after "in-home" insert "health" (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1281, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-17 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-05-13 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-05-12 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-05-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-05-06 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-05-05 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2014-04-01 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-31 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2014-03-28 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-03-25 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |