CO HB1274 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the ability of the boards of county commissioners to delegate to county administrative officials certain land use determinations affecting subdivision platting.
Title
Board County Commissioners Delegation Subdivision Platting
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-29 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 61 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 56 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1274, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1274, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1274, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1274, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 56 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1274, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1274, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1274, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 19-1274, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-29 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-04-27 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |
2019-04-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-05 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-03 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government |