CO HB1274 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-06 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the limited circumstances under which a veterinarian may use a compounded pharmaceutical drug for the treatment of an animal patient that is a food animal.
Title
Veterinary Pharmaceutical Compounding Animal Patient
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - House: Concur in Senate Amendment (Y: 57 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1274, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1274, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 17-1274, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 17-1274, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1274, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1274, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-10 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 17-1274, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - House - House Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 17-1274, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-06 | Governor Signed | |
2017-05-18 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-05-17 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-05-05 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-04-10 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-07 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-04-06 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-03 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |