CO HB1271 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-01 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the authorization of economic development rates to be charged by electric utilities to qualifying nonresidential customers.
Title
Public Utilities Commission Electric Utilities Economic Development Rates
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Gray [D] | Rep. Yeulin Willett [R] | Sen. John Tate [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 18-1271 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1271, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1271, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 18-1271 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 46 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1271, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 18-1271, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Governor Signed | |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2018-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Reconsidered - No Amendments |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2018-04-11 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-04-10 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-04-05 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-03-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |