CO HB1264 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-2)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 48-2)
Status: Passed on June 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-23 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the allocation of state money for workforce development activities to increase the skills of Colorado workers, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Funds Workforce Development Increase Worker Skills
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.008) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1264, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 21-1264 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1264, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1264, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1264, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-04 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Amend (l.008) (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1264, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.004 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 21-1264 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 43 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 21-1264, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-28 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1264, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Adopt amendment L.002 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 21-1264, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-23 | Governor Signed | |
2021-06-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-06-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-06-18 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-06-07 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2021-06-04 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2021-04-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-28 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-21 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2021-04-06 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |