CO HB1260 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-5)
Status: Passed on May 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-5)
Status: Passed on May 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning tax incentives to maximize investments in semiconductor and advanced manufacturing in Colorado, and, in connection therewith, authorizing the economic development commission to approve refund certificates for certain income tax credits, creating a semiconductor manufacturing zone program, modifying the Colorado job growth incentive tax credit for semiconductor and advanced manufacturing, creating an advanced industries task force, and making an appropriation.
Title
Advanced Industry and Semiconductor Manufacturing Incentives
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 56 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 58 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1260, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 23-1260 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1260, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 23-1260 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-07 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 58 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1260, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-05 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.003 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 23-1260 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-03 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 54 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 23-1260, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 23-1260 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-20 | Governor Signed | |
2023-05-12 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-05-11 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-05-07 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2023-05-06 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2023-05-03 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-05-02 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2023-04-20 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2023-04-18 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-04-03 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2023-03-26 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Finance |