CO HB1257 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the adoption of 2022 recommendations of the Colorado criminal juvenile justice commission regarding sentencing provisions for offenses, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
2022 Criminal And Juvenile Justice Commission Recommendations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1257 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1257, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1257, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1257, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1257, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1257, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002, as amended (Attachment B) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1257, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1257 to the Committee on Judiciary. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 40 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1257 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1257, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-10 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1257, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-04 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1257, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1257, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1257, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment C) (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.002, as amended (Attachment B) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1257, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - House State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs: Refer House Bill 22-1257 to the Committee on Judiciary. (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Governor Signed | |
2022-04-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-03-31 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-03-23 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2022-03-22 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2022-03-04 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-03 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-03-03 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-01 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-02-24 | House | House Committee on State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs Refer Unamended to Judiciary |
2022-02-22 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Civic, Military, & Veterans Affairs |