CO HB1256 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-12 - Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a clarification of the minimum distance from which certain oil and gas facilities must be located from any school.
Title
Oil And Gas Facilities Distance From School Property
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Foote [D] | Sen. Matt Jones [D] | Sen. Irene Aguilar [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Postpone House Bill 17-1256 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Postpone House Bill 17-1256 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment N) to House Bill 17-1256. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-23 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 17-1256, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 17-1256, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy: Postpone House Bill 17-1256 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-29 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment N) to House Bill 17-1256. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-23 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 17-1256, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-23 - House - House Health, Insurance, & Environment: Refer House Bill 17-1256, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |
2017-03-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-28 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-14 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |