CO HB1255 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-21 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Manage Forests To Improve Water Supply Conditions
Title
Manage Forests To Improve Water Supply Conditions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-01 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1255, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1255, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1255, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1255, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2016-03-24 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1255, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1255, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-02-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1255, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 16-1255, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | Governor Signed |
2016-04-11 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2016-04-11 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2016-04-07 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2016-04-01 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2016-04-01 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture, Natural Resources, & Energy |
2016-03-08 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2016-03-04 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 03/08/2016 - No Amendments |
2016-03-02 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2016-02-29 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2016-02-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources |