CO HB1250 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-07 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Water Conservation Bd Construction Fund

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water Conservation Bd Construction Fund

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-04-30 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW as amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-15 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1250 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - House - FINAL VOTE - COW (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-24 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 10-1250 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-06-07 Governor Action - Signed
2010-05-24 Sent to the Governor
2010-05-24 Signed by the President of the Senate
2010-05-20 Signed by the Speaker of the House
2010-05-11 House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2010-05-10 Senate Third Reading Passed
2010-05-07 Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments
2010-05-04 Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2010-04-30 Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2010-04-15 Senate Committee on Agriculture and Natural Resources Refer Amended to Appropriations
2010-03-18 Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture and Natural Resources + Appropriations
2010-03-15 House Third Reading Passed
2010-03-12 House Second Reading Passed
2010-03-09 House Second Reading Laid Over Daily
2010-03-05 House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2010-02-24 House Committee on Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2010-02-03 Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Livestock, & Natural Resources + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B50F3A56D93F778D872576B600807073?Open
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B50F3A56D93F778D872576B600807073/$FILE/1250_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B50F3A56D93F778D872576B600807073/$FILE/1250sagr_01.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B50F3A56D93F778D872576B600807073/$FILE/1250sagrapp.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B50F3A56D93F778D872576B600807073/$FILE/1250_eng.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B50F3A56D93F778D872576B600807073/$FILE/1250_ren.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B50F3A56D93F778D872576B600807073/$FILE/1250_rev.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B50F3A56D93F778D872576B600807073/$FILE/1250_rer.pdf
Texthttp://www.leg.state.co.us/clics/clics2010a/csl.nsf/fsbillcont2/B50F3A56D93F778D872576B600807073/$FILE/1250_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/4F3AD1E78FB7D034872576D400725361
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/1E873C72195A5875872576DD00546C65
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/DD98D2A1E7E6C45587257706006D0649
Roll Callhttp://www.leg.state.co.us/CLICS/CLICS2010A/commsumm.nsf/IndSumm/C9907E980D8899908725771500533395

Bill Comments

feedback