CO HB1249 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a state income tax credit for active agricultural stewardship practices, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Tax Credit Agricultural Stewardship Practices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 57 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1249, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1249, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1249 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 24-1249, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 24-1249, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1249, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment L.005 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 24-1249, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 24-1249 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 24-1249, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Adopt amendment L.003 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 24-1249, as amended, to the Committee on Finance. (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance |
2024-04-29 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2024-04-25 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-25 | House | House Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-03-11 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources Refer Amended to Finance |
2024-02-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources |