CO HB1238 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the authority of the division of housing to regulate factory-built structures.
Title
Clarification Of Manufactured Housing Standards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 19-1238 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 19-1238 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate Business, Labor, & Technology: Refer House Bill 19-1238 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 64 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Business Affairs & Labor: Refer House Bill 19-1238 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | Governor Signed | |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-22 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Business, Labor, & Technology Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Business, Labor, & Technology |
2019-03-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-22 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-03-20 | House | House Committee on Business Affairs & Labor Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-12 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Business Affairs & Labor |