CO HB1234 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-19 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning establishing a preventing identity-based violence grant program, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Preventing Identity-based Violence Grant Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1234 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1234 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1234, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1234, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1234, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1234 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1234 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 39 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 22-1234, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1234, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 22-1234, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Governor Signed | |
2022-05-09 | Sent to the Governor | |
2022-05-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2022-05-06 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2022-03-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2022-03-24 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-03-23 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2022-03-22 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2022-03-18 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2022-03-02 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2022-02-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |