CO HB1232 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning public utilities providing infrastructure to serve alternative fuel motor vehicles, and, in connection therewith, establishing a process at the Colorado public utilities commission whereby a public utility may undertake implementation of an alternative fuel motor vehicle infrastructure program within the area covered by the utility's certificate of public convenience and necessity.
Title
Public Utilities Alternative Fuel Motor Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Postpone House Bill 17-1232 indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1232, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1232, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1232, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 17-1232, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Postpone Indefinitely |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-04-17 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-13 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor |
2017-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-11 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-10 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2017-04-03 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 04/10/2017 - No Amendments |
2017-03-29 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-07 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |