CO HB1220 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-4)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 38-4)
Status: Passed on June 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-07 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning implementing recommendations of the Colorado child support commission.
Title
Colorado Child Support Commission Recommendations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 44 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1220 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1220, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1220, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 56 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1220 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 51 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1220, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services: Refer House Bill 21-1220, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-07 | Governor Signed | |
2021-05-28 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-28 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2021-05-27 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2021-04-29 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2021-04-28 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2021-04-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2021-04-09 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2021-04-06 | House | House Committee on Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-11 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public & Behavioral Health & Human Services |