CO HB1211 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-27 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Restrict Travel State-chartered Entities
Title
Restrict Travel State-chartered Entities
Sponsors
Rep. Sal Pace [D] | Sen. Lois Tochtrop [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt the rerevised version of the bill as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt the rerevised version of the bill as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt the rerevised version of the bill as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1211, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1211, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1211, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1211, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1211, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1211, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt the rerevised version of the bill as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to adopt the rerevised version of the bill as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1211, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1211, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1211, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1211, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1211, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-10 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1211, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole with favorable recommendation (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-27 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-05-17 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-17 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-05-17 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass | |
2011-05-11 | House Consideration of First Conference Committee Report result was to Adopt Committee Report - Repass | |
2011-05-10 | First Conference Committee Result was to Adopt Rerevised w/ Amendments | |
2011-05-06 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Not Concur - Request Conference Committee | |
2011-05-03 | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-29 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-28 | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-26 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2011-03-25 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary | |
2011-03-18 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-17 | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-15 | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-03-10 | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-03-03 | House Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only | |
2011-02-04 | Introduced In House - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |