CO HB1210 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
County & Agency Agreement Fire Costs On State Land
Title
County & Agency Agreement Fire Costs On State Land
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1210 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1210, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1210, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1210, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.001 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-02-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1210, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-11 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-04-03 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-04-03 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-04-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-03-28 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2014-03-28 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2014-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-24 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Local Government Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Local Government |
2014-02-26 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-25 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2014-02-20 | House | House Committee on Local Government Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Local Government |