CO HB1208 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing Multi-district Administrative Units
Title
Authorizing Multi-district Administrative Units
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1208 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1208 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1208 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1208 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-03-06 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1208 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1208 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1208 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-03-17 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-03-17 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-03-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee on Education Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Education |
2014-02-21 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-20 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-02-17 | House | House Committee on Education Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-01-30 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Education |