CO HB1206 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-13 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Debt-management Services Act
Title
Uniform Debt-management Services Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1206 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1206 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1206, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1206, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 11-1206 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1206, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-17 - House - FINAL VOTE - Moved to refer House Bill 11-1206, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Governor Action - Signed | |
2011-04-05 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-04-05 | Signed by the President of the Senate | |
2011-04-04 | Signed by the Speaker of the House | |
2011-03-29 | Senate Third Reading Passed | |
2011-03-25 | Senate Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-24 | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily | |
2011-03-21 | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary | |
2011-02-28 | House Third Reading Passed | |
2011-02-25 | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments | |
2011-02-22 | House Second Reading Special Order - Laid Over Daily | |
2011-02-17 | House Committee on Economic and Business Development Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole | |
2011-02-04 | Introduced In House - Assigned to Economic and Business Development |