CO HB1202 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the food systems advisory council, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.
Title
Food Systems Advisory Council
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1202, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1202, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 19-1202 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1202, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1202, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1202, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1202, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1202, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 19-1202 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1202, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1202, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1202, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | Governor Signed | |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-05-14 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2019-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-04-30 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2019-04-29 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-04-28 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-04-27 | Senate | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2019-04-27 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2019-04-16 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2019-04-15 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2019-04-12 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2019-04-12 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2019-03-04 | House | House Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Amended to Appropriations |
2019-02-20 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture + Appropriations |