CO HB1202 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the food systems advisory council, and, in connection therewith, making an appropriation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Food Systems Advisory Council

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - House - House: Senate Amendments Concur (Y: 45 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - House - House: Senate Amendments Repass (Y: 41 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1202, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1202, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 19-1202 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 42 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Adopt amendment J.001 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-04-12 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 19-1202, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1202, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House Rural Affairs & Agriculture: Refer House Bill 19-1202, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31 Governor Signed
2019-05-14SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2019-05-14HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2019-05-14 Sent to the Governor
2019-04-30SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass
2019-04-29SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-28SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-27SenateHouse Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily
2019-04-27SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-26SenateSenate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-25SenateSenate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-23SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2019-04-18SenateSenate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2019-04-16SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources
2019-04-16HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2019-04-15HouseHouse Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments
2019-04-12HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee
2019-04-12HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole
2019-03-04HouseHouse Committee on Rural Affairs & Agriculture Refer Amended to Appropriations
2019-02-20HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Rural Affairs & Agriculture + Appropriations

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb19-1202
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1202_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1202_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1202_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1202_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1202_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2019A/bills/2019a_1202_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2ed89f97ccbb63f2872583b30077252f-hb19-1202-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/2ed89f97ccbb63f2872583b30077252f-hb19-1202-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/176bd18fdd7bdda1872583da004c1055-hb19-1202-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/176bd18fdd7bdda1872583da004c1055-hb19-1202-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1202vote5c5963
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/1b720852c2f77ae5872583e0007407a6-hb19-1202-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c92c49452f5e6dac872583e5004c15da-hb19-1202-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/c92c49452f5e6dac872583e5004c15da-hb19-1202-1-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1202vote6b1ada
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1202vote022f9b
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb19-1202vote020b9e

Bill Comments

feedback