CO HB1198 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform Interstate Family Support Act 2008 Update
Title
Uniform Interstate Family Support Act 2008 Update
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Foote [D] | Sen. Pat Steadman [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Reconsider House Bill 15-1198 (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1198 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1198 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1198, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1198 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1198 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment A) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1198, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-05-04 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-04 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-05-04 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-04-22 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Laid Over Daily |
2015-04-22 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |
2015-02-25 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-02-24 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-02-19 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-02-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |