CO HB1196 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning updates to the laws governing mobile home parks.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mobile Home Park Act Updates

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 24 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-02 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1196 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer House Bill 20-1196 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 41 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - House Appropriations: Refer House Bill 20-1196 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1196, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1196, as amended, to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-30 Governor Signed
2020-06-29 Sent to the Governor
2020-06-29SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-06-29HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-06-05SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-04SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-06-02SenateSenate Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-05-26SenateSenate Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations
2020-03-10SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary
2020-03-09HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-06HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Committee, Floor
2020-03-03HouseHouse Second Reading Laid Over to 03/06/2020 - No Amendments
2020-02-28HouseHouse Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-02-19HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Amended to Appropriations
2020-01-30HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1196
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1196_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1196_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1196_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1196_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1196_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1196_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0f12c58b08e01761872585140000be5f-hb20-1196-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/4513b0676ced96f68725851c00533a8a-hb20-1196-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1196vote5e091c
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/bc3a8c70612ec9fa87258574005c2a3d-hb20-1196-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0e36a98cc0d19d718725857b004bb2af-hb20-1196-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1196vote5f10f5
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/0f12c58b08e01761872585140000be5f-hb20-1196-1-activity-vote-summary

Bill Comments

feedback