CO HB1191 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Add Dentists To Physician Designation Act
Title
Add Dentists To Physician Designation Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-25 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1191 to the Committee of the Whole with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1191, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Adopt amendment L.002 (Attachment E) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-02-26 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 15-1191, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-10 | House | Governor Signed |
2015-04-07 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-04-07 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2015-04-02 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2015-03-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2015-03-06 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2015-02-26 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance, & Environment Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2015-01-29 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance, & Environment |