CO HB1188 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning bias-motivated harassment.
Title
Harassment Sexual Orientation Or Disability
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1188 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1188, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1188, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - Senate State, Veterans, & Military Affairs: Refer House Bill 17-1188 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House: Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1188, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 17-1188, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Governor Signed | |
2017-04-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-21 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on State, Veterans, & Military Affairs Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to State, Veterans, & Military Affairs |
2017-03-15 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2017-03-14 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2017-03-09 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2017-02-17 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |