CO HB1181 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 23 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-23 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the repeal of the fuel tax exemption for nonprofit transit agencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Nonprofit Transit Authority Agency Fuel Tax

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate Transportation & Energy: Refer House Bill 20-1181 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House Transportation & Local Government: Refer House Bill 20-1181 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-23 Sent to the Governor
2020-03-17HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2020-03-17SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2020-03-05SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-03-04SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-27SenateSenate Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Senate Committee of the Whole
2020-02-20SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation & Energy
2020-02-18HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-14HouseHouse Second Reading Special Order - Passed - No Amendments
2020-02-11HouseHouse Committee on Transportation & Local Government Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2020-01-30HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Local Government

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb20-1181
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1181_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1181_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1181_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1181_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1181_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2020A/bills/2020a_1181_enr.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/cdac71a04e6c6e4b8725850b0062ad4d-hb20-1181-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1181vote5a84b7
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/e86d1851ddc3fa4a8725851b0079ea24-hb20-1181-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb20-1181vote5b2890

Bill Comments

feedback