CO HB1181 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-22 - Governor Action - Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tobacco Program Cash Funds
Title
Tobacco Program Cash Funds
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Consent Calendar The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Consent Calendar The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1181 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1181 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Consent Calendar The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - L.004 The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Consent Calendar The motion passed without objection. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-08 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - COW AMD The motion passed on a vote of 7-0. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1181 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 13-1181 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-22 | House | Governor Action - Signed |
2013-03-19 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-03-14 | House | House Considered Senate Amendments - Result was to Concur - Repass |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee on Appropriations Refer Amended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Appropriations |
2013-02-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-26 | House | House Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-22 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily |
2013-02-19 | House | House Committee on Health, Insurance & Environment Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2013-01-31 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Health, Insurance & Environment |