CO HB1180 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Postpone Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning access by a mental health professional to the files of a regulatory board regarding a dismissed complaint filed against the mental health professional.
Title
Mental Health Professional Dismissed Complaint Colorado Open Records Act Access
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Postpone House Bill 18-1180 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Postpone House Bill 18-1180 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1180, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1180, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Adopt amendment L.003 (Attachment B) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-21 - Senate - Senate Health & Human Services: Postpone House Bill 18-1180 indefinitely using a reversal of the previous roll call. There was no objection to the use of the reverse roll call, therefore, the bill was postponed indefinitely. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 44 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1180, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House Public Health Care & Human Services: Refer House Bill 18-1180, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health & Human Services Postpone Indefinitely |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Health & Human Services |
2018-02-27 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2018-02-26 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over to 02/27/2018 - No Amendments |
2018-02-23 | House | House Second Reading Passed with Amendments - Committee |
2018-02-20 | House | House Committee on Public Health Care & Human Services Refer Amended to House Committee of the Whole |
2018-02-02 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Public Health Care & Human Services |