CO HB1179 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-7)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the maximum uncommitted reserve that may be retained in the agricultural products inspection cash fund.
Title
Agricultural Products Inspection Cash Fund Reserve
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 31 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 23-1179 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 23-1179 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Senate Agriculture & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 23-1179 to the Committee of the Whole and with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 55 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources: Refer House Bill 23-1179 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Governor Signed | |
2023-04-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2023-04-12 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture & Natural Resources Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Agriculture & Natural Resources |
2023-03-09 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2023-03-08 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2023-03-06 | House | House Committee on Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2023-02-08 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Agriculture, Water & Natural Resources |