CO HB1179 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-18 - House Second Reading Laid Over to 07/15/2021 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-18 - House Second Reading Laid Over to 07/15/2021 - No Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the creation of the "Uniform Recognition and Enforcement of Canadian Domestic Violence Protection Orders Act".
Title
Canadian Domestic Violence Protection Orders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-09 - House - House Judiciary: Refer House Bill 21-1179 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-18 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 07/15/2021 - No Amendments |
2021-03-16 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over to 03/19/2021 - No Amendments |
2021-03-12 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2021-03-09 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2021-03-04 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |