CO HB1177 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 25-14)
Status: Passed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-22 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Concerning the inclusion of use tax exemptions for certain existing sales tax exemptions in order to make the exemptions compatible with fundamental principles of sales and use tax.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Add Use Tax Exemption To Some Sales Tax Exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Senate Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1177 to the Committee of the Wholeand with a recommendation that it be placed on the consent calendar. (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - House - House: Third Reading Bill (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - House Finance: Refer House Bill 21-1177 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-22 Governor Signed
2021-04-14 Sent to the Governor
2021-04-13SenateSigned by the President of the Senate
2021-04-13HouseSigned by the Speaker of the House
2021-04-09SenateSenate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-08SenateSenate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-04-05SenateSenate Committee on Finance Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole
2021-03-29SenateIntroduced In Senate - Assigned to Finance
2021-03-25HouseHouse Third Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-03-24HouseHouse Second Reading Passed - No Amendments
2021-03-22HouseHouse Committee on Finance Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole
2021-03-04HouseIntroduced In House - Assigned to Finance

Colorado State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://leg.colorado.gov/bills/hb21-1177
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1177_01.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1177_eng.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1177_ren.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1177_rev.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1177_rer.pdf
Texthttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/2021a_1177_enr.pdf
Supplementhttps://leg.colorado.gov/sites/default/files/documents/2021A/bills/fn/2021a_hb1177_00.pdf
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/fec1853b3577abd8872586a0006b8e1a-hb21-1177-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1177vote54d8d3
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/8ef1fa0abd1c10a3872586ae006b8929-hb21-1177-0-activity-vote-summary
Roll Callhttps://leg.colorado.gov/content/hb21-1177vote56a864

Bill Comments 750

feedback