CO HB1176 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Emissions Program Audit Cycle
Title
Emissions Program Audit Cycle
Sponsors
Rep. Su Ryden [D] | Sen. Lois Tochtrop [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Senate - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1176 to the Committee of the Whole and placed on the consent calendar The motion passed on a vote of 4-0. (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1176 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1176 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1176 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1176 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1176 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1176 to the Committee of the Whole (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1176 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - House - FINAL VOTE - Refer House Bill 14-1176 to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | House | Governor Signed |
2014-04-17 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2014-04-17 | House | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2014-04-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker of the House |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on Transportation Refer Unamended - Consent Calendar to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Transportation |
2014-03-12 | House | House Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-11 | House | House Third Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2014-03-10 | House | House Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2014-03-07 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2014-02-20 | House | House Committee on Transportation & Energy Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2014-01-28 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Transportation & Energy |